. KUMKUM LATA
. Kumkum Lata is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of . Kumkum Lata is 09024353.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of . Kumkum Lata
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRAHMASHANTI INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2021 | Active | Director | 9 January 2021 | 28 February 2022 | Buy financial reports |
AARU CHARU MOTER PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2023 | Active | Director | 19 November 2023 | 21 November 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with . Kumkum Lata are Raj Kumar.
FAQ - . Kumkum Lata
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
. Kumkum Lata serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of . Kumkum Lata?
The DIN of . Kumkum Lata is 09024353.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of . Kumkum Lata?
The longest directorship of . Kumkum Lata is with BRAHMASHANTI INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More