KUMAR ARVIND
Kumar Arvind is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Kumar Arvind is 09377450.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Kumar Arvind
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GSTARK CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Finance | 2021 | Active | Director | 27 October 2021 | 2 September 2022 | Buy financial reports |
XLTAX ADVISORY LLP | 2022 | Active | Director | 10 October 2022 | 12 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Kumar Arvind are Saurabh Pandey, Mamta Kumari, Tripti Shrivastava.
FAQ - Kumar Arvind
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Kumar Arvind serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Kumar Arvind?
The DIN of Kumar Arvind is 09377450.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Kumar Arvind?
The longest directorship of Kumar Arvind is with GSTARK CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More