KARTAR SINGH
Kartar Singh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Kartar Singh is 10007923.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as , Real Estate and Renting etc.
Following are the directorship details of Kartar Singh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
J&J INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS LLP | 2022 | Inactive for e-filing | Director | 24 June 2022 | 25 June 2022 | Buy financial reports | |
ENVIRONMENT TESTING LAB SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED | Real Estate and Renting | 2023 | Active | Director | 19 December 2023 | 21 December 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Kartar Singh are Neelam Rani.
FAQ - Kartar Singh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Kartar Singh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Kartar Singh?
The DIN of Kartar Singh is 10007923.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Kartar Singh?
The longest directorship of Kartar Singh is with J&J INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More