JYOTI DIYA
Jyoti Diya is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Jyoti Diya is 06449133.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Jyoti Diya
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIDHYASAGAR INFRASTRUCTURE LLP | Construction | 2017 | Active | Director | 18 July 2017 | 5 April 2019 | Buy financial reports |
DEVJYOT TRADE PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2013 | Active | Director | 22 July 2013 | 22 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Jyoti Diya are Suryansh Diya, Chetanya Diya.
FAQ - Jyoti Diya
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Jyoti Diya serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Jyoti Diya?
The DIN of Jyoti Diya is 06449133.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Jyoti Diya?
The longest directorship of Jyoti Diya is with DEVJYOT TRADE PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More