JAYA KRISHNA
Jaya Krishna is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Jaya Krishna is 09408353.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Health and Social Work, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Jaya Krishna
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIZUDDHA PRAKRITIKA FOUNDATION | Health and Social Work | 2021 | Active | Director | 22 November 2021 | 15 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
CELESTIUMEVENTS LLP | 2023 | Active | Director | 7 June 2023 | 18 September 2024 | Buy financial reports |
FAQ - Jaya Krishna
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Jaya Krishna serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Jaya Krishna?
The DIN of Jaya Krishna is 09408353.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Jaya Krishna?
The longest directorship of Jaya Krishna is with VIZUDDHA PRAKRITIKA FOUNDATION.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More