JAMAL AYESHA
Jamal Ayesha is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Jamal Ayesha is 01946426.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as , Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Jamal Ayesha
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamal Legal Consultants LLP | 2022 | Active | Director | 1 July 2022 | 2 July 2022 | Buy financial reports | |
MF BATTERY WORLD PVT LTD, | Business Services | 1994 | Active | Director | 18 July 1994 | 24 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Jamal Ayesha are Jamal Mohamed Hamza, Hasani Mannani Jamal.
FAQ - Jamal Ayesha
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Jamal Ayesha serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Jamal Ayesha?
The DIN of Jamal Ayesha is 01946426.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Jamal Ayesha?
The longest directorship of Jamal Ayesha is with MF BATTERY WORLD PVT LTD,.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More