HEENA SHAH
Heena Shah is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Heena Shah is 08741385.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Heena Shah
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GOLDENHORDE PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2020 | Active | Director | 12 May 2020 | 22 February 2022 | Buy financial reports |
MEGAKLEOS PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2020 | Active | Director | 5 July 2020 | 5 September 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Heena Shah are Mihir Tejanshu Shah.
FAQ - Heena Shah
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Heena Shah serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Heena Shah?
The DIN of Heena Shah is 08741385.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Heena Shah?
The longest directorship of Heena Shah is with GOLDENHORDE PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More