HAYATULLA KHAN
Hayatulla Khan is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Hayatulla Khan is 00649418.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Hayatulla Khan
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAMDHANI COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2004 | Active | Director | 22 June 2018 | 25 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
S M STEELS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 1974 | Active | Director | 21 July 1997 | 3 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Hayatulla Khan are Anwarul Islam.
FAQ - Hayatulla Khan
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Hayatulla Khan serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Hayatulla Khan?
The DIN of Hayatulla Khan is 00649418.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Hayatulla Khan?
The longest directorship of Hayatulla Khan is with S M STEELS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More