HARI KRISHNA
Hari Krishna is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Hari Krishna is 09625157.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Hari Krishna
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MITR SEWA NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2022 | Active | Director | 30 May 2022 | 13 September 2023 | Buy financial reports |
MITR SEWA INSURANCE AND FINTECH PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2021 | Active | Director | 8 October 2022 | 23 November 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Hari Krishna are Prem Azad Singh, Renu Singh.
FAQ - Hari Krishna
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Hari Krishna serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Hari Krishna?
The DIN of Hari Krishna is 09625157.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Hari Krishna?
The longest directorship of Hari Krishna is with MITR SEWA NIDHI LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More