HANISH GUPTA
Hanish Gupta is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Hanish Gupta is 09010428.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Hanish Gupta
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
URBAN NEST PROJECTS LLP | Construction | 2021 | Active | Director | 24 February 2021 | 25 February 2021 | Buy financial reports |
SAHIB TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2020 | Active | Director | 28 January 2021 | 1 May 2021 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Hanish Gupta are Rakesh Kumar Gupta.
FAQ - Hanish Gupta
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Hanish Gupta serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Hanish Gupta?
The DIN of Hanish Gupta is 09010428.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Hanish Gupta?
The longest directorship of Hanish Gupta is with SAHIB TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More