HAFEES
Hafees is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Hafees is 07103566.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Hafees
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANASEVANAA NYAYAVILA BAZAAR PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2017 | Active | Director | 1 March 2017 | 25 March 2022 | Buy financial reports |
FAIRTREAT EXPORTS AND TOURS PRIVATE LIMITED (OPC) | Business Services | 2015 | Active | Director | 16 March 2015 | 31 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Hafees are Saira Hafiz.
FAQ - Hafees
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Hafees serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Hafees?
The DIN of Hafees is 07103566.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Hafees?
The longest directorship of Hafees is with FAIRTREAT EXPORTS AND TOURS PRIVATE LIMITED (OPC).
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More