GURBACHAN SINGH
Gurbachan Singh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Gurbachan Singh is 07779333.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Gurbachan Singh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SATGURU ASHIANA PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2017 | Active | Director | 26 August 2017 | 15 September 2021 | Buy financial reports |
CM BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2017 | Active | Director | 18 May 2017 | 22 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Gurbachan Singh are Inderjeet Kaur, Rajni, Satbir Singh.
FAQ - Gurbachan Singh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Gurbachan Singh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Gurbachan Singh?
The DIN of Gurbachan Singh is 07779333.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Gurbachan Singh?
The longest directorship of Gurbachan Singh is with CM BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More