GOWRAMMA
Gowramma is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Gowramma is 02970681.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Gowramma
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIDDHAMA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2019 | Active | Director | 4 July 2019 | 29 August 2022 | Buy financial reports |
GPB BUILDERS & PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2010 | Active | Director | 7 June 2010 | 16 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Gowramma are Baskarnaidu, Muralidharan Muthukrishnan.
FAQ - Gowramma
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Gowramma serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Gowramma?
The DIN of Gowramma is 02970681.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Gowramma?
The longest directorship of Gowramma is with GPB BUILDERS & PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More