GOPAL CHINEY
Gopal Chiney is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Gopal Chiney is 01141217.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Gopal Chiney
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEHARI LALL DEY PVT LTD | Trading | 1986 | Active | Director | 1 July 1991 | 20 December 2023 | Buy financial reports |
NANDY DEY PVT LTD | Trading | 1954 | Active | Director | 14 April 1981 | 17 April 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Gopal Chiney are Haladhar Dey, Sanat Kumar Nandy, Arup Kumar Nandy.
FAQ - Gopal Chiney
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Gopal Chiney serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Gopal Chiney?
The DIN of Gopal Chiney is 01141217.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Gopal Chiney?
The longest directorship of Gopal Chiney is with NANDY DEY PVT LTD.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More