GEETA SRIVASTAVA
Geeta Srivastava is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Geeta Srivastava is 07293420.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Geeta Srivastava
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMVI ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2015 | Active | Director | 28 September 2015 | 23 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
AMVI BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2019 | Active | Director | 25 January 2019 | 13 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Geeta Srivastava are Amit Kumar Srivastava.
FAQ - Geeta Srivastava
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Geeta Srivastava serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Geeta Srivastava?
The DIN of Geeta Srivastava is 07293420.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Geeta Srivastava?
The longest directorship of Geeta Srivastava is with AMVI ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More