EKTA SHARMA
Ekta Sharma is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Ekta Sharma is 00118665.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Ekta Sharma
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SRI BALAJEE TECHNOMEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2008 | Active | Director | 16 January 2008 | 8 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
BALAJEE FILTRATION PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2014 | Active | Director | 21 August 2014 | 8 August 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Ekta Sharma are Sharad Chandra Sharma, Gaurav Sharma.
FAQ - Ekta Sharma
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Ekta Sharma serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Ekta Sharma?
The DIN of Ekta Sharma is 00118665.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Ekta Sharma?
The longest directorship of Ekta Sharma is with SRI BALAJEE TECHNOMEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More