DIPTI TAYAL
Dipti Tayal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Dipti Tayal is 08469604.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Dipti Tayal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PYTEX IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 1995 | Active | Director | 5 June 2019 | 6 August 2023 | Buy financial reports |
ASHANK TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2010 | Active | Director | 19 October 2020 | 8 August 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Dipti Tayal are Ashish Tayal.
FAQ - Dipti Tayal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Dipti Tayal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Dipti Tayal?
The DIN of Dipti Tayal is 08469604.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Dipti Tayal?
The longest directorship of Dipti Tayal is with PYTEX IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More