DILSUKH GARHWAL
Dilsukh Garhwal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Dilsukh Garhwal is 08463797.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Dilsukh Garhwal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SEWAA SERVAGYA NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2019 | Active | Director | 27 May 2019 | 3 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
RCR FUND NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2018 | Active | Director | 4 December 2019 | 24 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Dilsukh Garhwal are Rakesh Kumar, Sandeep Jangir, Ashish Jangir, Abhishek Jangir.
FAQ - Dilsukh Garhwal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Dilsukh Garhwal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Dilsukh Garhwal?
The DIN of Dilsukh Garhwal is 08463797.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Dilsukh Garhwal?
The longest directorship of Dilsukh Garhwal is with SEWAA SERVAGYA NIDHI LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More