DILIP MAHESHWARI
Dilip Maheshwari is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Dilip Maheshwari is 00378139.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Dilip Maheshwari
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAMANUJ BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2011 | Active | Director | 7 March 2011 | 11 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
RAMANUJ BUILDCON LLP | 2023 | Active | Director | 18 July 2023 | 19 July 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Dilip Maheshwari are Nilesh Nanda.
FAQ - Dilip Maheshwari
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Dilip Maheshwari serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Dilip Maheshwari?
The DIN of Dilip Maheshwari is 00378139.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Dilip Maheshwari?
The longest directorship of Dilip Maheshwari is with RAMANUJ BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More