DHIRAJ KUMAR
Dhiraj Kumar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Dhiraj Kumar is 08650013.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Dhiraj Kumar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FREEDOM ONLINE TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2019 | Active | Director | 25 December 2019 | 13 April 2022 | Buy financial reports |
SAKSHAM SARVA INDIA NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2021 | Active | Director | 17 February 2021 | 27 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Dhiraj Kumar are Nayan Kumar, Roshan Kumar.
FAQ - Dhiraj Kumar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Dhiraj Kumar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Dhiraj Kumar?
The DIN of Dhiraj Kumar is 08650013.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Dhiraj Kumar?
The longest directorship of Dhiraj Kumar is with FREEDOM ONLINE TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More