DHIRAJ ANILRAO SAKHALKAR
Dhiraj Anilrao Sakhalkar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Dhiraj Anilrao Sakhalkar is 03016669.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Dhiraj Anilrao Sakhalkar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUMEIRAH CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2017 | Active | Director | 9 June 2017 | 20 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
VF ULTRA LLP | 2023 | Inactive for e-filing | Director | 23 May 2023 | 24 May 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Dhiraj Anilrao Sakhalkar are Prachi Dhiraj Sakhalkar.
FAQ - Dhiraj Anilrao Sakhalkar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Dhiraj Anilrao Sakhalkar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Dhiraj Anilrao Sakhalkar?
The DIN of Dhiraj Anilrao Sakhalkar is 03016669.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Dhiraj Anilrao Sakhalkar?
The longest directorship of Dhiraj Anilrao Sakhalkar is with JUMEIRAH CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More