DEEPAK KUMAR
Deepak Kumar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Deepak Kumar is 07221980.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Deepak Kumar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CONCEPT TRADEHOME PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2015 | Active | Director | 25 June 2015 | 30 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
VG EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2015 | Active | Director | 9 April 2016 | 10 May 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Deepak Kumar are Vikas Kumar, Pankaj Grover.
FAQ - Deepak Kumar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Deepak Kumar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Deepak Kumar?
The DIN of Deepak Kumar is 07221980.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Deepak Kumar?
The longest directorship of Deepak Kumar is with CONCEPT TRADEHOME PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More