CHHATTAR SINGH BAFNA
Chhattar Singh Bafna is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Chhattar Singh Bafna is 03265900.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Chhattar Singh Bafna
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAI MATA DI DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2009 | Active | Director | 1 October 2012 | 15 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
CORNATION TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2000 | Active | Director | 2 May 2012 | 13 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Chhattar Singh Bafna are Sangeeta Bafna.
FAQ - Chhattar Singh Bafna
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Chhattar Singh Bafna serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Chhattar Singh Bafna?
The DIN of Chhattar Singh Bafna is 03265900.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Chhattar Singh Bafna?
The longest directorship of Chhattar Singh Bafna is with CORNATION TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More