CHETNA
Chetna is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Chetna is 09556036.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Health and Social Work, Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Chetna
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANKALYAAN MICRO SERVICE FEDERATION | Health and Social Work | 2022 | Active | Director | 31 March 2022 | 1 April 2022 | Buy financial reports |
SMBE SUGAM NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2020 | Active | Director | 10 June 2022 | 22 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
FAQ - Chetna
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Chetna serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Chetna?
The DIN of Chetna is 09556036.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Chetna?
The longest directorship of Chetna is with JANKALYAAN MICRO SERVICE FEDERATION.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More