CHANCHAL SINGH
Chanchal Singh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Chanchal Singh is 00583111.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Chanchal Singh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAMJEE STRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2001 | Active | Director | 20 April 2004 | 14 April 2022 | Buy financial reports |
RAMJEE POWER CONSTRUCTION LIMITED | Construction | 1996 | Active | Director | 5 November 1996 | 14 September 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Chanchal Singh are Ashok Kumar Singh, Satish Kumar Das.
FAQ - Chanchal Singh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Chanchal Singh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Chanchal Singh?
The DIN of Chanchal Singh is 00583111.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Chanchal Singh?
The longest directorship of Chanchal Singh is with RAMJEE POWER CONSTRUCTION LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More