CGV KRISHNAN
Cgv Krishnan is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Cgv Krishnan is 00002680.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Cgv Krishnan
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAGHAVANS CHIT FUNDS PRIVATE LIMITED | Finance | 1964 | Active | Director | 9 August 1984 | 25 February 2022 | Buy financial reports |
C G V CHIT FUNDS PRIVATE LIMITED | Finance | 1994 | Active | Director | 30 March 1994 | 11 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Cgv Krishnan are Krishnan Swarna.
FAQ - Cgv Krishnan
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Cgv Krishnan serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Cgv Krishnan?
The DIN of Cgv Krishnan is 00002680.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Cgv Krishnan?
The longest directorship of Cgv Krishnan is with RAGHAVANS CHIT FUNDS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More