BIMLA MAJUMDAR
Bimla Majumdar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Bimla Majumdar is 06754525.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Bimla Majumdar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHREE VENKETESH DEVCON LLP | Construction | 2015 | Active | Designated Partner | 20 February 2015 | 28 November 2018 | Buy financial reports |
SHREE VENKETESH DEVCON PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2010 | Converted to LLP and Dissolved | Director | 2 December 2013 | 1 May 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Bimla Majumdar are Rohit Pathak, Rahul Singh.
FAQ - Bimla Majumdar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Bimla Majumdar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Bimla Majumdar?
The DIN of Bimla Majumdar is 06754525.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Bimla Majumdar?
The longest directorship of Bimla Majumdar is with SHREE VENKETESH DEVCON PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More