BHARAT BHUSHAN
Bharat Bhushan is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Bharat Bhushan is 08432949.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Bharat Bhushan
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TARA PROJECTS (INDIA) LIMITED | Trading | 2011 | Active | Director | 13 June 2019 | 15 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
TARA INDIA LIMITED | Trading | 1998 | Active | Director | 15 April 2019 | 17 October 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Bharat Bhushan are Man Mohan Shastri, Sheel Prabha, Ravi Bhardwaj, Pallavi Shastri.
FAQ - Bharat Bhushan
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Bharat Bhushan serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Bharat Bhushan?
The DIN of Bharat Bhushan is 08432949.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Bharat Bhushan?
The longest directorship of Bharat Bhushan is with TARA INDIA LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More