BALVANT SINGH
Balvant Singh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Balvant Singh is 07553181.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Education, Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Balvant Singh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BATRA DEFENCE ACADEMY PRIVATE LIMITED | Education | 2021 | Not available for efiling | Director | 28 December 2021 | 29 December 2021 | Buy financial reports |
PFIXS VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2018 | Active | Director | 9 July 2018 | 5 September 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Balvant Singh are Priyanka Singh.
FAQ - Balvant Singh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Balvant Singh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Balvant Singh?
The DIN of Balvant Singh is 07553181.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Balvant Singh?
The longest directorship of Balvant Singh is with PFIXS VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More