BALJEET
Baljeet is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Baljeet is 08636331.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Baljeet
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BSHAKTI LIMITED | Trading | 2019 | Active | Director | 12 December 2019 | 11 June 2022 | Buy financial reports |
REDLEAF MARKETING LIMITED | Business Services | 2019 | Under Process of Striking Off | Director | 22 March 2019 | 7 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Baljeet are Karan Singh, Kamaljeet Singh, Naresh Kumar, Balkar Singh.
FAQ - Baljeet
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Baljeet serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Baljeet?
The DIN of Baljeet is 08636331.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Baljeet?
The longest directorship of Baljeet is with REDLEAF MARKETING LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More