AYSHA KHATOON
Aysha Khatoon is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Aysha Khatoon is 08300912.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Aysha Khatoon
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUBEDA UDYOG PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2018 | Active | Director | 11 December 2018 | 22 July 2021 | Buy financial reports |
TASLIMA EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2019 | Active | Director | 7 January 2019 | 2 March 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Aysha Khatoon are Sefali Khatun.
FAQ - Aysha Khatoon
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Aysha Khatoon serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Aysha Khatoon?
The DIN of Aysha Khatoon is 08300912.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Aysha Khatoon?
The longest directorship of Aysha Khatoon is with RUBEDA UDYOG PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More