Avinash
Avinash is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Avinash is 08583470.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Avinash
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BACHATKING SAHAYOG NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2020 | Active | Director | 2 June 2020 | 2 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
CUBIT FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED | Finance | 2019 | Active | Director | 10 October 2019 | 19 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Avinash are Ankit Saini, Mamta Saini.
FAQ - Avinash
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Avinash serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Avinash?
The DIN of Avinash is 08583470.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Avinash?
The longest directorship of Avinash is with CUBIT FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More