ASHOK KUMAR RAJGARIA
Ashok Kumar Rajgaria is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Ashok Kumar Rajgaria is 00394111.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Ashok Kumar Rajgaria
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAJGARIA MANUFACTURERS PVT.LTD. | Trading | 1993 | Active | Director | 25 January 1993 | 25 April 2022 | Buy financial reports |
CROSSWORD COMMODITIES PVT LTD | Trading | 1995 | Active | Director | 29 March 1999 | 13 June 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Ashok Kumar Rajgaria are Ashish Kumar Rajgaria.
FAQ - Ashok Kumar Rajgaria
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Ashok Kumar Rajgaria serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Ashok Kumar Rajgaria?
The DIN of Ashok Kumar Rajgaria is 00394111.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Ashok Kumar Rajgaria?
The longest directorship of Ashok Kumar Rajgaria is with RAJGARIA MANUFACTURERS PVT.LTD..
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More