ASHOK AGARWAL
Ashok Agarwal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Ashok Agarwal is 07755162.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Ashok Agarwal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MCS INFRA SOLUTION LLP | Construction | 2017 | Active | Director | 10 March 2017 | 8 December 2018 | Buy financial reports |
VEBLEN TECHNO INFRASTRUCTURE LLP | Construction | 2017 | Active | Director | 25 September 2017 | 5 April 2019 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Ashok Agarwal are Manish Kumar, Monika Agrawal.
FAQ - Ashok Agarwal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Ashok Agarwal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Ashok Agarwal?
The DIN of Ashok Agarwal is 07755162.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Ashok Agarwal?
The longest directorship of Ashok Agarwal is with MCS INFRA SOLUTION LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More