ARVIND YADAV
Arvind Yadav is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Arvind Yadav is 08984320.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance, Computer Related Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Arvind Yadav
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADSPAYMEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | Finance | 2015 | Active | Director | 28 March 2022 | 19 February 2024 | Buy financial reports |
MARKET RIGHT MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | Computer Related Services | 2020 | Active | Director | 4 December 2020 | 26 February 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Arvind Yadav are Bhanu Pandey.
FAQ - Arvind Yadav
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Arvind Yadav serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Arvind Yadav?
The DIN of Arvind Yadav is 08984320.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Arvind Yadav?
The longest directorship of Arvind Yadav is with MARKET RIGHT MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More