ARCHANA DANGE
Archana Dange is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Archana Dange is 05329088.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Education etc.
Following are the directorship details of Archana Dange
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELIOS EARLY LEARNING SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | Education | 2020 | Active | Director | 3 November 2020 | 29 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
ANANDDEEP ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED | Education | 2012 | Active | Director | 17 September 2012 | 24 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Archana Dange are Sivakumar Birur Chakravarthi.
FAQ - Archana Dange
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Archana Dange serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Archana Dange?
The DIN of Archana Dange is 05329088.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Archana Dange?
The longest directorship of Archana Dange is with ANANDDEEP ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More