ANUP GAJANAN SHARMA
Anup Gajanan Sharma is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Anup Gajanan Sharma is 08433174.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Education etc.
Following are the directorship details of Anup Gajanan Sharma
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NURTURING DESIGNERS ACADEMY LLP | Education | 2019 | Active | Director | 25 April 2019 | 21 June 2019 | Buy financial reports |
LA ARTISAN THE ART SCHOOL LLP | Education | 2021 | Active | Director | 6 July 2021 | 7 July 2021 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Anup Gajanan Sharma are Anuj Sharma, Harsha Anup Sharma.
FAQ - Anup Gajanan Sharma
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Anup Gajanan Sharma serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Anup Gajanan Sharma?
The DIN of Anup Gajanan Sharma is 08433174.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Anup Gajanan Sharma?
The longest directorship of Anup Gajanan Sharma is with NURTURING DESIGNERS ACADEMY LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More