ANKUR KUMAR NAWAL
Ankur Kumar Nawal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Ankur Kumar Nawal is 08453306.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Ankur Kumar Nawal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAWAL RENOVATIONS (OPC) PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2020 | Active | Director | 6 February 2020 | 18 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
RENOTECH HOMES PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2019 | Active | Director | 15 May 2019 | 7 May 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Ankur Kumar Nawal are Manish Chauhan.
FAQ - Ankur Kumar Nawal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Ankur Kumar Nawal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Ankur Kumar Nawal?
The DIN of Ankur Kumar Nawal is 08453306.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Ankur Kumar Nawal?
The longest directorship of Ankur Kumar Nawal is with RENOTECH HOMES PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More