ANKITA MITTAL
Ankita Mittal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Ankita Mittal is 08713674.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as , Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Ankita Mittal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bhuaji Chawal Udyog LLP | 2022 | Active | Director | 7 June 2022 | 13 June 2022 | Buy financial reports | |
BHUAJI FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2019 | Active | Director | 28 February 2020 | 26 June 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Ankita Mittal are Mahima Goyal, Prema Goyal, Govind Kumar Agrawal.
FAQ - Ankita Mittal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Ankita Mittal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Ankita Mittal?
The DIN of Ankita Mittal is 08713674.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Ankita Mittal?
The longest directorship of Ankita Mittal is with BHUAJI FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More