ANJU MODI
Anju Modi is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Anju Modi is 07810361.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Education, Health and Social Work etc.
Following are the directorship details of Anju Modi
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CCOGITO LEARNING LLP | Education | 2017 | Active | Director | 29 June 2017 | 4 April 2019 | Buy financial reports |
ANAM CARA FOUNDATION | Health and Social Work | 2020 | Active | Director | 1 September 2020 | 13 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Anju Modi are Ruchi Jhawar, Harshvardhan Modi, Sanjana Sanjay Harlalka.
FAQ - Anju Modi
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Anju Modi serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Anju Modi?
The DIN of Anju Modi is 07810361.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Anju Modi?
The longest directorship of Anju Modi is with CCOGITO LEARNING LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More