ANIL KUMHAR
Anil Kumhar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Anil Kumhar is 08533711.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Anil Kumhar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PIYUSH GEMS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2011 | Active | Director | 13 August 2019 | 30 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
ANSHUL GEMS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2009 | Active | Director | 16 August 2019 | 10 May 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Anil Kumhar are Anilkumar Jain, Rahul Jain.
FAQ - Anil Kumhar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Anil Kumhar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Anil Kumhar?
The DIN of Anil Kumhar is 08533711.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Anil Kumhar?
The longest directorship of Anil Kumhar is with PIYUSH GEMS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More