ANAS JAVID DALAL
Anas Javid Dalal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Anas Javid Dalal is 03493676.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Anas Javid Dalal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FUTURE FINCAP SERVICES LIMITED | Finance | 2010 | Active | Director | 17 September 2011 | 15 February 2017 | Buy financial reports |
JSDC LLP | 2023 | Inactive for e-filing | Director | 3 January 2023 | 4 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Anas Javid Dalal are Wasim Javid Dalal, Javid Sattar Dalal.
FAQ - Anas Javid Dalal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Anas Javid Dalal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Anas Javid Dalal?
The DIN of Anas Javid Dalal is 03493676.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Anas Javid Dalal?
The longest directorship of Anas Javid Dalal is with FUTURE FINCAP SERVICES LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More