ANANT TUTEJA
Anant Tuteja is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Anant Tuteja is 06663142.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Anant Tuteja
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MH-INNOVATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2022 | Active | Director | 31 August 2022 | 15 March 2023 | Buy financial reports |
MOPED HOUSE PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2012 | Active | Director | 8 August 2013 | 12 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Anant Tuteja are Neelam Tuteja, Chandra Kesh Tuteja, Naina Garg.
FAQ - Anant Tuteja
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Anant Tuteja serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Anant Tuteja?
The DIN of Anant Tuteja is 06663142.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Anant Tuteja?
The longest directorship of Anant Tuteja is with MOPED HOUSE PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More