AMIT LALIT AGARWAL
Amit Lalit Agarwal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Amit Lalit Agarwal is 01673104.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Amit Lalit Agarwal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SKYRAH REALTY LLP | Construction | 2020 | Active | Director | 29 December 2020 | 30 December 2020 | Buy financial reports |
KNEST DOORS LLP | 2021 | Active | Director | 28 January 2022 | 22 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Amit Lalit Agarwal are Nitin Surendra Mittal, Sumit Lalit Agarwal.
FAQ - Amit Lalit Agarwal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Amit Lalit Agarwal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Amit Lalit Agarwal?
The DIN of Amit Lalit Agarwal is 01673104.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Amit Lalit Agarwal?
The longest directorship of Amit Lalit Agarwal is with SKYRAH REALTY LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More