AMISHA SINGH
Amisha Singh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Amisha Singh is 10048449.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Unknown, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Amisha Singh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAROJ SHARMA FOUNDATION | Unknown | 2023 | Active | Director | 26 April 2023 | 2 May 2023 | Buy financial reports |
GARICH CORP LLP | 2023 | Active | Director | 13 July 2023 | 14 July 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Amisha Singh are Saroj Sharma, Rashi Joshi, Srishti Sharma, Preety Verma.
FAQ - Amisha Singh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Amisha Singh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Amisha Singh?
The DIN of Amisha Singh is 10048449.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Amisha Singh?
The longest directorship of Amisha Singh is with SAROJ SHARMA FOUNDATION.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More