AMAN AGRAWAL
Aman Agrawal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Aman Agrawal is 06930496.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Aman Agrawal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PUNCTUAL VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2010 | Active | Director | 29 August 2014 | 15 June 2022 | Buy financial reports |
ASHRAM STEELS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 1992 | Active | Director | 27 May 2020 | 6 August 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Aman Agrawal are Sanjeev Kumar Agrawal, Vivek Singh.
FAQ - Aman Agrawal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Aman Agrawal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Aman Agrawal?
The DIN of Aman Agrawal is 06930496.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Aman Agrawal?
The longest directorship of Aman Agrawal is with PUNCTUAL VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More