AKSHAY DIXIT
Akshay Dixit is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Akshay Dixit is 09554407.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Unknown etc.
Following are the directorship details of Akshay Dixit
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AADISHRI MEDICAL EQUIPMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2022 | Active | Director | 30 March 2022 | 3 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
SAMRIDDHI TECHNO CONCEPT PRIVATE LIMITED | Unknown | 2023 | Not available for efiling | Director | 13 June 2023 | 16 June 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Akshay Dixit are Shiwendra Kumar Shukla, Nitesh Kumar Shukla.
FAQ - Akshay Dixit
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Akshay Dixit serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Akshay Dixit?
The DIN of Akshay Dixit is 09554407.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Akshay Dixit?
The longest directorship of Akshay Dixit is with AADISHRI MEDICAL EQUIPMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More