AJIT SINGH
Ajit Singh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Ajit Singh is 02526288.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services, Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Ajit Singh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAY AAR BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 1991 | Active | Director | 28 February 2009 | 12 May 2024 | Buy financial reports |
R G S TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Finance | 1992 | Active | Director | 22 November 2012 | 13 May 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Ajit Singh are Sukhjeet Singh.
FAQ - Ajit Singh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Ajit Singh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Ajit Singh?
The DIN of Ajit Singh is 02526288.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Ajit Singh?
The longest directorship of Ajit Singh is with JAY AAR BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More