AJAY VERMA
Ajay Verma is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Ajay Verma is 07317483.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Ajay Verma
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZEALOS DESIGN STUDIO PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2020 | Active | Director | 10 January 2020 | 21 February 2022 | Buy financial reports |
UNIO LABS PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2015 | Active | Director | 15 October 2015 | 18 September 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Ajay Verma are Mahender Kumar Verma, Laxmi Varma.
FAQ - Ajay Verma
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Ajay Verma serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Ajay Verma?
The DIN of Ajay Verma is 07317483.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Ajay Verma?
The longest directorship of Ajay Verma is with UNIO LABS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More