ABU FARZAD
Abu Farzad is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Abu Farzad is 08044044.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Abu Farzad
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALIM ASSOCIATES BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2012 | Active | Director | 4 January 2018 | 22 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
S & A BUILDERS AND ENGINEERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2010 | Active | Director | 26 July 2019 | 10 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Abu Farzad are Rayamarakkar Abu Salim, Kamila Salim.
FAQ - Abu Farzad
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Abu Farzad serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Abu Farzad?
The DIN of Abu Farzad is 08044044.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Abu Farzad?
The longest directorship of Abu Farzad is with SALIM ASSOCIATES BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More